Soliman, Wael Soliman Abd Eldaim (CPSO#: 83965)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Minya, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2006 to 26 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008