Solomon, Jill Karen (CPSO#: 72623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Lipes, Jill Karen (used until: 23 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Malvern Medical Clinic
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-7719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jill Solomon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Solomon ( CPSO# 72623 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Gneeral Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Clinic
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
Suite 100
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 250-5000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL KAREN SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002