Solomon, Sukumar Devachandran (CPSO#: 42792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Solomon, Surumar Devachandran (used until: 09 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellmedica
2-90 Resolution Dr
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Electoral District: 05

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 1979 to 31 Jan 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 10 Jul 1979
Other - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sukumar Devachandran Solomon may practise family medicine at:

                  (i)   Wellmedica   in   Brampton,   Ontario,   while   under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  only  in  accordance  with the Retraining Program approved  by  the
                        College.
                  
            2.    Dr. Solomon shall not be the most responsible physician for any patients. 

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            4.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Solomon's knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Solomon's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Solomon's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2018, and will expire on  or before
                  November 30, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.