Soman, Teesta Basu (CPSO#: 80622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Nov 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5668
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Teesta  Basu  Soman  may  practise  medicine  independently  in Paediatric
            Neurology, only.