Somasundaram, Nilany (CPSO#: 96546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone: (519) 925-0017
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Rutherford Road
Unit 11
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nilany Somasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Somasundaram ( CPSO# 96546 )

Business Address:
Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 925-0017

Business Address:
460 Grace Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8V7
Phone Number: (905) 895-7661

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILANY SOMASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013