Somerville, Scott Shaw (CPSO#: 95291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Endocrinology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2133
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT SHAW SOMERVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMERVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 21 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016