Sommers, Ryan Brook (CPSO#: 94523)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2013