Somogyi, Ron Barry (CPSO#: 88860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Plastic Surgery
Suite 410
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-6336
Fax: (416) 323-6325
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

555 Finch Ave W
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

162 Cumberland Street West
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R3N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron B. Somogyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Somogyi ( CPSO# 88860 )

Business Address:
Toronto Plastic Surgery
Suite 410
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-6336

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RON BARRY SOMOGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMOGYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014