Song, Xinni (CPSO#: 74933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Box 912
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xinni Song Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Song ( CPSO# 74933 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
General Division
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XINNI SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 25 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2000 to 25 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2001 to 23 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005