Song, Yuning (CPSO#: 92986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Toronto ON  L6R3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yuning Song Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Song ( CPSO# 92986 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUNING SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2016