Sood, Priya Darshni (CPSO#: 82984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hemant Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sood ( CPSO# 82984 )
Dr. H. Shah ( CPSO# 79465 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 9EN-220
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4946


Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Sood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sood ( CPSO# 82984 )
Dr. H. Shah ( CPSO# 79465 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Sciences Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA DARSHNI SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007