Sood, Rickesh (CPSO#: 86180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2702
Fax: (519) 942-0483
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carlton & Church Medical & Walk-In
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scope Clinic
470 Chrysler Drive, Units 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-7030
Fax: (905) 790-7487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

WestGTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
2225 Erin Mills Pk
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T8
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: (905) 823-9780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 700
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-551-6006
Fax: 416-551-6009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sood ( CPSO# 86180 )
Dr. S. Jha ( CPSO# 96272 )

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 551-6006

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Business Address:
470 Chrysler
Suite 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICKESH SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007