Soor, Gursharan Singh (CPSO#: 93117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shelburne Centre For Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone: (519) 925-0017
Fax: (519) 925-6717
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gursharan Soor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soor ( CPSO# 93117 )

Business Address:
Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 925-0017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 17, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gursharan Singh Soor,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Soor to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. GURSHARAN SINGH SOOR
                                          ("Dr. Soor")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Soor, certificate of registration number 93117, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215291 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.


            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        emergency medicine, other than expressly set out in this
                        undertaking.  
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to practice emergency medicine under the
                        guidance of a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor(s)") at a University- affiliated hospital with
                        an Emergency medicine program, on the terms set out below.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that Clinical Supervision shall cease only
                        upon approval from the College on the terms set out below.
                  
                  
                  High Level Supervision
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that I shall engage in Clinical Supervision
                        at a high level for a minimum period of six (6) months, during
                        which I will practice a minimum of eight (8), eight (8)-hour shifts
                        per month ("High Level Supervision"). 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake and acknowledge that during High Level
                        Supervision:
                  
                        i.    I shall not be the Most Responsible Physician ("MRP") for
                              patient care.  The Clinical Supervisor shall be the MRP for
                              all patient encounters while I am under High Level
                              Supervision. 
                  
                        ii.   I shall not implement any management plan with respect to any
                              patient without prior review and approval by the Clinical
                              Supervisor. 
                  
                        iii.  The Clinical Supervisor shall provide a written report to the
                              College on a monthly basis, detailing the care and treatment
                              observed, providing feedback on my documentation and care as
                              well as providing feedback on areas for improvement.

                  Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that following the period of High Level
                        Supervision, and only upon recommendation by the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and subject to the approval of the College, the
                        Clinical Supervision may be reduced to a moderate level, for a
                        minimum period of three (3) months, during which I will practice a
                        minimum of eight (8), eight (8)-hour shifts per month ("Moderate
                        Level Supervision").
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake and acknowledge that during Moderate Level
                        Supervision:
                  
                        i.    I shall be the MRP for patient care. 

                        ii.   I shall not be the only emergency physician on site at any
                              time during my shifts.  Another emergency physician shall be
                              available at all times. 
                  
                        iii.  The Clinical Supervisor shall review monthly:
                  
                              1.    a minimum of 20 charts; and, 
                              2.    charts of all trauma patients seen in the supervision
                                    period
                  
                              and meet with me weekly to discuss any concerns arising from
                              the chart reviews.
                  
                        iv.   The Clinical Supervisor shall provide a written report to the
                              College  every three months, detailing the care and treatment
                              reviewed, providing feedback on my documentation and care as
                              well as providing feedback on areas for improvement.
                  
                  
                  Low Level Supervision
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that following the period of Moderate
                        Level Supervision, and only upon recommendation by the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and subject to the approval of the College, the
                        Clinical Supervision may be reduced to a low level for a minimum of
                        six months (6) months, during which I practice a minimum of eight
                        (8), eight (8)-hour shifts  per month  ("Low Level Supervision").
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake and acknowledge that during  Low Level
                        Supervision:
                  
                        i.    I shall be the MRP for patient care.  
                  
                        ii.   The Clinical Supervisor shall review, every three months:  
                  
                              1.     a minimum of 20 charts; and, 
                  
                              2.    charts of all trauma patients seen in the supervision
                                    period.
                  
                  
                        iii.  The Clinical Supervisor shall provide a written report to the
                              College every three months, detailing the care and treatment
                              reviewed, providing feedback on my documentation and care as
                              well as providing feedback on areas for improvement.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to maintain a log of all trauma patients
                        seen by me, in the form set out in Appendix "C" attached, which
                        contains patient  name and date of birth, the date that I see the
                        patient, the nature of the trauma and the disposition of the case.  
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that during Moderate and Low Level
                        Supervision, the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in the IEP
                        set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, shall
                        cease practising emergency medicine until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (6)(m) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; 
                  
                              2.    ATLS; and 
                  
                              3.    PALS
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to complete this requirement at the earliest
                        possible opportunity.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section B(6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Soor, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Soor, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Soor, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "D". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Soor, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Soor engaged
                        in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of
                        emergency medicine.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        -     Dr. Soor will practice under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 15 months. 
                        -     Dr. Soor shall not be the Most Responsible Physician in
                              emergency medicine for a minimum period of 6 months. 
                        -     Dr. Soor will engage in professional education in record
                              keeping and emergency medicine.
                        -     Dr. Soor's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Soor, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Soor, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Soor, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gursharan Singh Soor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 17, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Soor engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Soor will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 15 months.
• Dr. Soor shall not be the Most Responsible Physician in emergency medicine for a minimum period of 6 months.
• Dr. Soor will engage in professional education in record keeping and emergency medicine.
• Dr. Soor’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.