Sorial, Mary Latif Riad (CPSO#: 86967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Sorial Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sorial ( CPSO# 86967 )

Business Address:
Unit C
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LATIF RIAD SORIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORIAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009