Sothilingam, Niroshan Senthuran (CPSO#: 97210)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015