Soto Pulido, Claudia Milena (CPSO#: 91605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 Albert Street
West Parry Sound Health Center
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3314
Fax: (705) 746-2282
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C Soto Pulido Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Soto Pulido ( CPSO# 91605 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Center
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA MILENA SOTO PULIDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOTO PULIDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014