Soucie, Pierre Francois (CPSO#: 59199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-4565
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre F. Soucie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Soucie ( CPSO# 59199 )

Business Address:
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE FRANCOIS SOUCIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991