Soucy, Frederic (CPSO#: 85215)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2007