Souligny, Julie Sylvie (CPSO#: 77477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 21
5350 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9E2
Phone: (613) 695-5560
Fax: (613) 695-3536
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Souligny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Souligny ( CPSO# 77477 )

Business Address:
21 - 5350 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9E2
Phone Number: (613) 695-5560

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE SYLVIE SOULIGNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOULIGNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004