Sovran, Laura Deana (CPSO#: 90874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B2-443
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8223
Fax: 519-685-8771
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura D. Sovran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sovran ( CPSO# 90874 )

Business Address:
Suite B2-443
800 Commissioners Roas East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA DEANA SOVRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOVRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014