Sowerby, Leigh J (CPSO#: 84509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6143
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sowerby Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chen ( CPSO# 99673 )
Dr. L. Sowerby ( CPSO# 84509 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
B2500
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6143

Business Address:
339 Windemere Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6C 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEIGH J SOWERBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOWERBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012