Spaic, Tamara (CPSO#: 81327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Diabetes, Endocrinology
and Metabolism
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6370
Fax: (519) 646-6109
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519 685 8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Rm. E6-117
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Spaic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Spaic ( CPSO# 81327 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3584

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Division of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5 - 110
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMARA SPAIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPAIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Dec 2008 to 08 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2010 to 01 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2010 to 01 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008