Spano, Frank Anthony (CPSO#: 91615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
460 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4
Phone: 5194910050
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.A. Spano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Spano ( CPSO# 91615 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
460 North Christine Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Spano's medical records are being stored at 457 London Road Sarnia, Ontario N7T 4W9
Date Received: 25 Jul 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 24 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK ANTHONY SPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011