Spaziani, Robert (CPSO#: 73513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32203
Fax: (905) 526-0540
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Spaziani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Spaziani ( CPSO# 73513 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite H427
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SPAZIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPAZIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2004