Spazzapan, Simon Emilio (CPSO#: 92707)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Rome, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 19 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010