Spence, Jessica Diana (CPSO#: 96749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
Health Sciences Centre Room 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75170
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Spence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 96749 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
Health Sciences Centre Room 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA DIANA SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2015 to 21 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018