Springer-Cyrus, Erika Angela (CPSO#: 92150)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, Barbados, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 12 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 13 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011