Srinivas, Coimbatore Vasudevamoorthy (CPSO#: 82216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Bangalore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6960
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.V. Srinivas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Srinivas ( CPSO# 82216 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 464-1319

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COIMBATORE VASUDEVAMOORTHY SRINIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 10 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010