Srinivasan, Sathish (CPSO#: 83284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 17 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 2011