Srivastava, Ankur (CPSO#: 113943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 18 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 525 9140 Ext. 26660
Fax: (905) 527-2707
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANKUR SRIVASTAVA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SRIVASTAVA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SRIVASTAVA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SRIVASTAVA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SRIVASTAVA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SRIVASTAVA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SRIVASTAVA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019