Srivastava, Siddhartha (CPSO#: 95358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 1018
Queens University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (619) 533-2780
Fax: (613) 533-6654
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lui & Srivastava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lui ( CPSO# 92096 )
Dr. S. Srivastava ( CPSO# 95358 )

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Hematology
Etherington Hall-Room 2025
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall-Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDDHARTHA SRIVASTAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIVASTAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015