St. Amand, Timothy Andre (CPSO#: 77846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z7
Canada
Phone: 905 688-2558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. St. Amand ( CPSO# 77846 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z7
Phone Number: (905) 688-2558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ANDRE ST. AMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. AMAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004