St. Bernard, Rosanne Maria (CPSO#: 95776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: St Bernard, Rosanne Maria (used until: 22 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand RIver Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2910
Fax: (519) 749-4448
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosanne St. Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. St. Bernard ( CPSO# 95776 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSANNE MARIA ST. BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015