St. Jacques, Nicole Simone (CPSO#: 91095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Court St. N
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7758
Fax: (807) 346-6209
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE SIMONE ST. JACQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. JACQUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011