St Pierre, Taunya Allyson (CPSO#: 86375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sports Medicine Centre
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1565 Maple Grover Road
Kanata ON  K2V 1A3
Phone: (613) 591-3939
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taunya St. Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. St Pierre ( CPSO# 86375 )

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
Sports Medicine Centre
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1565 Maple Grove Road
Kanata ON  K2V 1A3
Phone Number: (613) 591-3939

Business Address:
2 Costello Drive
Carleton Place ON  K7C 0C3
Phone Number: (613) 253-2112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAUNYA ALLYSON ST PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Jun 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 04 May 2009 to 29 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2012