St-Onge, Maude (CPSO#: 90171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 07 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015