Stacey, Matthew David Glenn (CPSO#: 88861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135496666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock street
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: 6135461240
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Stacey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stacey ( CPSO# 88861 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID GLENN STACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2010 to 23 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010