Stachon, Andrea Caroline (CPSO#: 80954)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Catolica do Parana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010