Stacpoole, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 86565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4279 Hixon St.
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Stacpoole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stacpoole ( CPSO# 86565 )

Business Address:
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE STACPOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACPOOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009