Stall, Richard Joel (CPSO#: 59141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3124
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1001-123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 975-8864
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard J. Stall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Berger ( CPSO# 63322 )
Dr. R. Stall ( CPSO# 59141 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
1001 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 975-8864

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOEL STALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1988