Stallwood, Mark Ian (CPSO#: 93038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Reg Health Sciences Cnt
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stallwood ( CPSO# 93038 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK IAN STALLWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALLWOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013