Stan, Florentina (CPSO#: 89558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  28 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
409 - 3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 333-5437
Fax: (905) 333-5352
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Florentina  Stan  may practise paediatrics at 3155 Harvester Road in
                  Burlington, Ontario, while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on March 28, 2019. 

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Stan's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College by the due date  or  if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Stan's practice or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Stan's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 30, 2014, and will expire  on  or
                  before March 28, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.