Stanisz, Joanna (CPSO#: 95880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA STANISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANISZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 10 Oct 2016 to 04 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2018