Stanley, Wayne Edgar (CPSO#: 85675)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 21 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Aug 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2015
Summary:

 On August 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Stanley committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients, and that he has 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Stanley did not contest the allegations. 
  
 Patient A saw Dr. Stanley five times between October 2006 and January 2012. In January 2012, 
 following discussion between Patient A and Dr. Stanley about the fact that Patient A’s left 
 testicle was still sore, Dr. Stanley asked Patient A to get on the examination table, remove his 
 pants and lie down. Dr. Stanley applied lubricant onto Patient A’s genitals, including his testicles 
 and penis. Dr. Stanley started touching Patient A’s genital area, including his testicles and penis, 
 and asked Patient A when he had last ejaculated. Dr. Stanley also asked how easy it was for 
 Patient A to have an erection. Patient A initially assumed that these questions and the touching 
 were part of a clinical examination.   
  
 Dr. Stanley began massaging the base of Patient A’s penis and rolled down his foreskin. At this 
 point, Patient A started to wonder if this was more than clinical touching. Dr. Stanley said he was 
 trying to increase the blood flow and told Patient A that he would have to achieve an erection for 
 the examination that Dr. Stanley was going to conduct. Dr. Stanley masturbated Patient A by 
 moving his hand up and down the shaft of Patient A’s penis. Dr. Stanley asked Patient A where 
 his sensitive places were located, what gets him erect, and what excites him. Patient A became 
 nervous and said “this is weird” a few times. Dr. Stanley abruptly stopped masturbating Patient 
 A.  
  
 Patient B saw Dr. Stanley fifteen times between October 2006 and February 2013.   
 Patient B had suffered injuries, including a fracture of the pelvis. At an appointment in 2009, Dr. 
 Stanley raised the issue of a “broken penis” [Peyronies Disease]. Dr. Stanley instructed Patient B 
 to get on the examination table and pull down his pants. Dr. Stanley masturbated Patient B by 
 moving his hand up and down the shaft of Patient B’s penis. Dr. Stanley told Patient B that he 
 wanted him to “get hard” and to ejaculate. He told Patient B to close his eyes and pretend he was 
 with his girlfriend as it would be easier to ejaculate. He commented that Patient B had a “nice 
 penis”. Dr. Stanley stated that he needed to see how far Patient B could ejaculate. At one point, 
 Dr. Stanley inserted one of his fingers into Patient B’s rectum. Patient B stated words to the 
 effect, “this isn’t going to happen”. Dr. Stanley stopped and Patient B pulled his pants up. 
  
 The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 - the Registrar revoke Dr. Stanley’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.  
 - Dr. Stanley appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 - Dr. Stanley reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required 
 under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security 
 acceptable to the College, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, in the amount of 
 $32,120.00 ($16,060.00 for each patient). 
 - Dr. Stanley pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 21, 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wayne Edgar Stanley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 12, 2017:

Dr. Stanley’s Certificate of Registration was revoked by Order of the Discipline Committee on August 21, 2015. Dr. Stanley was the subject of an additional referral to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of two patients and that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On the basis that Dr. Stanley has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College has withdrawn the additional referral to the Discipline Committee.
Download Full Document (PDF)