Stapleton, Robert John (CPSO#: 71427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District
Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373 Ext. 4136
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444 Ext. 4421
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Stapleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stapleton ( CPSO# 71427 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN STAPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAPLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2000