Starratt, Cameron Chambers (CPSO#: 95664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: (905) 873-2953
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1500 Dundas Street East
Inside Walmart
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (905) 212-1428
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Starratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Starratt ( CPSO# 95664 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 212-1433

Business Address:
Suite 110 - 111
3350 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3

Business Address:
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5

Business Address:
500 Hogarth Avenue
Geraldton ON  P0T 1M0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON CHAMBERS STARRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARRATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013