Stasko, Jody Ann (CPSO#: 93517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jody Stasko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stasko ( CPSO# 93517 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODY ANN STASKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STASKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015