Staunton, Marie (CPSO#: 80321)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2003 to 26 Jan 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 27 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2010