Stecho, William Marshal (CPSO#: 98023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Dept. of Pathology & Lab Medicine
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 25 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARSHAL STECHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STECHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2017