Steele, Andrew William
CPSO#:
64056
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Phone: (905) 4446688
Fax: (905) 4446687
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site |
Whitby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:05 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1992 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Update as of October 11, 2016: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)